Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Maxey | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |