Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative Krug added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vining, Billings, Conley, Neubauer, Haywood, Madison, Jacobson, Drake, Clancy, Hong, Moore Omokunde, Ratcliff, Palmeri, Emerson, Snodgrass, Sinicki, Ohnstad, Joers, Andraca, Bare, Shelton, Considine, Goyke, Shankland, Cabrera, Ortiz-Velez, Baldeh and Stubbs | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 3 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |