Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|