Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senator Hutton added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Decision of the Chair appealed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neubauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Michalski
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Testin added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|