House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:20 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Representative Maxey added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |