House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Introduced |