House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Representative Krug added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representatives Michalski and Rozar added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Representative Maxey added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |