House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Representative Allen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Introduced |