House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
|
|
|
House
|
12/28/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|