House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sortwell and Murphy | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Moses added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |