House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:03 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tusler | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 3 | ||
House | 06/29/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Moore Omokunde and Sinicki | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Behnke | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Behnke | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Introduced |