House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | LRB correction | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Introduced |