House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:24 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Mursau | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative O'Connor | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Introduced |