House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:23 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Introduced |