House
|
01/31/2024
|
Published 2-1-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 1-31-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 91
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 1-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance and Small Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representative Krug added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/21/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Representative Binsfeld added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|