House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Representatives Plumer, Conley and Joers added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Representatives Steffen and Sortwell added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Donovan | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Introduced |