House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Introduced |