House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Senator Nass withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Dittrich | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Introduced |