Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Representative Moses added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 3 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Introduced |