House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/29/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Introduced |