House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:26 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Katsma
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions pursuant to s. 13.52 Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|