Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB658 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 21, 2024 	Contact: Scott Grosz, Principal Attorney 
2023 Assembly Bill 658 Assembly Amendment 1 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 658 
2023 Assembly Bill 658 (AB 658) makes various changes to the statutes administered by the 
Department of Revenue (DOR). This includes provisions creating a sales tax exemption for road-
building equipment; increasing the income tax withholding threshold for nonresidents; modifying 
certification requirements for a qualified opportunity fund; modifying prohibitions on certain lottery 
games; and extending the capital gains exclusion to family members who inherit certain farms 
organized as an entity.  
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 
In addition to the changes described above, Assembly Amendment 1 (AA 1) modifies provisions created 
in 2023 Wisconsin Act 19 relating to a sales tax exemption for commercial loans. AA 1 clarifies that such 
commercial loans must be related to a business or agricultural purpose located in this state, and the 
exemption may first apply to tax years beginning in 2023. 
AA 1 also modifies provisions created in 2023 Wisconsin Act 73 relating to an electronic vaping device 
registry maintained by DOR and prohibiting the sale of electronic vaping devices that are not included 
on the registry. The amendment authorizes DOR to create the registry and begin enforcement no later 
than September 1, 2025, instead of March 1, 2025, as provided under Act 73.    
Additionally, AA 1 creates a nonstatutory provision increasing the full-time equivalent positions for 
DOR by 4.0 positions for cigarette, tobacco, and vapor enforcement, as of April 1, 2024, to be funded 
from the permanent endowment fund created from the state’s tobacco settlement agreement. The 
transfer from the permanent endowment fund to the Medical Assistance trust fund is reduced by the 
amount appropriated for cigarette, tobacco, and vapor enforcement in each fiscal year. 
BILL HISTORY 
2023 Assembly Bill 658 was introduced by Representative Katsma on November 9, 2023. On February 
7, 2024, Representative Katsma introduced Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Bill 658. On February 
8, 2024, the Joint Committee on Finance recommended adoption of Assembly Amendment 1 and 
passage of Assembly Bill 658, as amended, on successive votes of Ayes, 15; Noes, 0.  
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
SG:jal