House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Introduced |