House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Armstrong
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Armstrong
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Armstrong
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Armstrong
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2023
|
Representative Goeben added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|