House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 123
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|