House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/15/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/28/2023 | Representative Green added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representatives Rodriguez, Murphy, Brandtjen, Mursau and Subeck added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Senators Nass and Ballweg added as cosponsors | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Introduced |