Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Wittke added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Rettinger, Wittke and Tittl
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representatives Plumer and Conley added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|