House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Representatives Sapik and Dittrich added as coauthors | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Representatives Wichgers and O'Connor added as coauthors | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Introduced |