House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 6, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 8, Noes 2 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Introduced |