Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 39
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 63, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Decision of the Chair appealed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bare
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 7
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dallman
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|