Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Representatives Wichgers and Gustafson added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Representatives Knodl and Gundrum added as coauthors | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Introduced |