House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Representative Schutt added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/28/2023 | Representative Green added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Introduced |