House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative McGuire | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brooks | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Anderson, Baldeh, Conley and Ratcliff | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Senator Hutton added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |