House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 3 | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |