House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:04 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Introduced |