Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Representative Maxey added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |