House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 6, Noes 3 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 6, Noes 2 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Melotik | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Representative Macco added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |