House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Swearingen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Representative Callahan added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Representatives Vining and Tranel added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |