House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Representatives Baldeh and Goyke added as coauthors | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |