House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/15/2023 | Representatives Clancy and Madison added as coauthors | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |