House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wichgers | ||
House | 12/15/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Introduced |