House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Schraa | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schraa | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Allen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Armstrong added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/28/2023 | Representative O'Connor withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Representative Green added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |