House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 148
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Bodden added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Binsfeld and Joers
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|