House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Stubbs withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Representatives Sinicki and Subeck withdrawn as coauthors | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |