House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced |