House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Representative Myers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Representatives Jacobson and Palmeri added as coauthors | ||
House | 12/12/2023 | Representative Sinicki added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |