House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Representative Myers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Macco | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Representatives Jacobson and Palmeri added as coauthors | ||
House | 12/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/12/2023 | Representatives Sinicki, Subeck and Schraa added as coauthors | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |