House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spiros
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Plumer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Government Accountability and Oversight and referred to committee on State Affairs pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Representative Michalski added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|