House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:33 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative VanderMeer
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative VanderMeer
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions pursuant to s. 13.52 Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Representative Green added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|