House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Introduced |